NY A04177 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to calculation of the earned income credit.
Title
Relates to calculation of the earned income credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | motion to discharge lost |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |