NY A04235 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to medical parole and determinations of whether a person released on medical parole is physically or cognitively incapable of presenting a danger to society.
Title
Relates to medical parole and determinations of whether a person released on medical parole is physically or cognitively incapable of presenting a danger to society.
Sponsors
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Latrice Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.161 |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.166 |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S02688 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION