NY A04258 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing rent subsidies to individuals living with roommates.
Title
Relates to providing rent subsidies to individuals living with roommates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | signed chap.624 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1008 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4339 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.136 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S04339 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - signed chap.624