NY A04259 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - advanced to third reading cal.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that advertisements which include a discount or rebate in the advertised price also include the actual selling price prior to any deductions in the same font and size.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that advertisements which include a discount or rebate in the advertised price also include the actual selling price prior to any deductions in the same font and size.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.137
2019-03-12Assemblyreported
2019-03-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-01Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback