NY A04268 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to mandating training of direct care workers in adverse childhood experiences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to mandating training of direct care workers in adverse childhood experiences.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-30Senate3RD READING CAL.998
2019-05-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2659
2019-05-20SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-05-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.340
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-01Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S02659 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4268

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04268&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04268&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04268
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04268&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04268&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04268&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A4268#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback