NY A04273 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This amendment will require the enactment of a code of corporate responsibility and requires corporations formed under laws of other states to pay registration fees and taxes.
Title
CONCURRENT RESOLUTION OF THE SENATE AND ASSEMBLY proposing amendments to sections 1 and 4 of article 10 of the constitution, in relation to corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | |
2009-02-23 | opinion referred to judiciary | |
2009-02-05 | to attorney-general for opinion | |
2009-02-02 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |