NY A04310 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to birth certificates for inmates; requires birth certificate or certification of birth and social security card to be kept in the inmate records until the inmate is released from custody when such birth certificate or certification of birth and social security card shall be provided to the inmate.
Title
Relates to birth certificates for inmates; requires birth certificate or certification of birth and social security card to be kept in the inmate records until the inmate is released from custody when such birth certificate or certification of birth and social security card shall be provided to the inmate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.165 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.341 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S04212 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES