NY A04315 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state liquor authority to make available to the public information pertaining to any conditions it imposes on a licensed premises.
Title
Requires the state liquor authority to make available to the public information pertaining to any conditions it imposes on a licensed premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.340 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.406 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | substituted for a4315 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | referred to economic development |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.267 |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s55 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.406 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00055 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.340