NY A04346 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to findings of the state board of parole necessary for discretionary release of incarcerated persons on parole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to findings of the state board of parole necessary for discretionary release of incarcerated persons on parole.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-30Assemblyprint number 4346a
2019-05-30Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to correction
2019-02-04Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S00497 (Same As) 2019-05-31 - PRINT NUMBER 497A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback