NY A04364 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 41-4)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Sauquoit Creek as an inland waterway for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Sauquoit Creek as an inland waterway for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | print number 4364a |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02906 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.278