NY A04366 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reversion of certain parkland to the city of New York if such parkland is not used for the purpose of construction and operation of a pre-kindergarten center with a focus on instruction in science, technology, engineering, and mathematics.
Title
Relates to the reversion of certain parkland to the city of New York if such parkland is not used for the purpose of construction and operation of a pre-kindergarten center with a focus on instruction in science, technology, engineering, and mathematics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.231 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.446 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a4366a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1617 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6250A |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6250a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.446 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.446 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 4366a |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06250 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.231