NY A04399 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the small business innovation research/small business technology transfer technical assistance program.
Title
Creates the small business innovation research/small business technology transfer technical assistance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | print number 4399a |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to small business |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to small business |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S00082 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 82A