NY A04416 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to violations of safety conditions in adult care facilities; provides penalties for safety violations and operating without a valid license; prohibits reductions in fines in certain circumstances where a patient is endangered or harmed.
Title
Relates to violations of safety conditions in adult care facilities; provides penalties for safety violations and operating without a valid license; prohibits reductions in fines in certain circumstances where a patient is endangered or harmed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | print number 4416c |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | print number 4416b |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | print number 4416a |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03460 (Same As) 2020-03-17 - PRINT NUMBER 3460A