NY A04417 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.177
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.177
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires charter buses to use commercial global positioning system technology which takes into account the minimum clearance of the motor vehicle.
Title
Requires charter buses to use commercial global positioning system technology which takes into account the minimum clearance of the motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.177 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.447 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a4417a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2978A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.151 |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s2978a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.447 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.447 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | print number 4417a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02978 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.177