NY A04421 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - signed chap.163
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts "Harper's Law" which will require that retailers who sell certain new furniture offer for sale compatible tip restraint devices and post a notice informing consumers of the risk of furniture tipping.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts "Harper's Law" which will require that retailers who sell certain new furniture offer for sale compatible tip restraint devices and post a notice informing consumers of the risk of furniture tipping.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13Senatesigned chap.163
2019-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-05-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-30Senate3RD READING CAL.545
2019-05-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1627B
2019-05-30SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2019-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-20Assemblyamended on third reading 4421b
2019-05-06Assemblyamended on third reading 4421a
2019-03-14Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.139
2019-03-12Assemblyreported
2019-03-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-04Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S01627 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4421B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04421
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04421A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04421B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A4421#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback