NY A04426 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a New York state physical fitness and activity education campaign.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a New York state physical fitness and activity education campaign.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.278
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04Senate3RD READING CAL.1515
2018-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8716
2018-03-19SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2018-03-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.331
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.518
2017-05-23Assemblyreported
2017-04-25Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-02-02Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S08716 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4426

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04426&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04426&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04426
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04426&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04426&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04426&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A4426#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback