NY A04452 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to licenses to purchase, store or use certain compounds; $50 fee.
Title
Relates to licenses to purchase, store or use certain compounds; $50 fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.80 |
2019-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.734 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.343 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a4452 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.446 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s1456 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.343 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.343 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01456 (Same As) 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.80