NY A04466 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - print number 4466a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - print number 4466a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of the offense of coercion in the second degree to include the production or dissemination of intimate images; and relates to the definition of "sex offense".
Title
Expands the definition of the offense of coercion in the second degree to include the production or dissemination of intimate images; and relates to the definition of "sex offense".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Assembly | print number 4466a |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04345 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to codes