NY A04467 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - signed chap.152
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that an individual who has been the victim of a family offense pursuant to the criminal procedure law or the family court act may make a complaint to any local law enforcement agency in the state regardless of where the act took place.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that an individual who has been the victim of a family offense pursuant to the criminal procedure law or the family court act may make a complaint to any local law enforcement agency in the state regardless of where the act took place.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-08Senatesigned chap.152
2019-08-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.676
2019-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1243B
2019-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.501
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-15Assemblyprint number 4467a
2019-05-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental operations
2019-02-04Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S01243 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4467A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04467&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04467&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04467
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04467&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04467A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04467&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04467&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04467&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A4467#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback