NY A04469 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - advanced to third reading cal.805
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - advanced to third reading cal.805
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes health care facilities or part of a facility operated or supervised by the department of correctional services or by local correctional facilities within the definition of hospital.
Title
Includes health care facilities or part of a facility operated or supervised by the department of correctional services or by local correctional facilities within the definition of hospital.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.805 |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.216 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.216 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-02-05 | Assembly | referred to health |