NY A04469 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to applications for child care assistance; authorizes the use of a simplified application form for persons applying only for child care assistance.
Title
Relates to applications for child care assistance; authorizes the use of a simplified application form for persons applying only for child care assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | tabled |
2015-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.226 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5419 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.308 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S05419 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4469