NY A04481 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a program to promote leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment and establishes the leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment fund; authorizes the commissioner of taxation and finance to create a check-off gift on individual income tax returns for contributions to leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a program to promote leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment and establishes the leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment fund; authorizes the commissioner of taxation and finance to create a check-off gift on individual income tax returns for contributions to leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13Senatesigned chap.266
2019-09-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1768
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4423
2019-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.502
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-02-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-04Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04423 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4481

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04481&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04481&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04481
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04481&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04481&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04481&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A4481#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback