NY A04492 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain health insurance policies to include coverage for the cost of certain infant and baby formulas.
Title
Requires certain health insurance policies to include coverage for the cost of certain infant and baby formulas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | committed to insurance |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.164 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.322 |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-02-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03270 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES