NY A04508 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-6)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts Carlos' law; relates to crimes involving the death or injury of a worker; establishes higher fines for corporations who commit such crimes; establishes the crimes of endangering the welfare of a worker in the third, second and first degrees.
Title
Enacts Carlos' law; relates to crimes involving the death or injury of a worker; establishes higher fines for corporations who commit such crimes; establishes the crimes of endangering the welfare of a worker in the third, second and first degrees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.171 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4508a |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.66 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03314 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 3314A