NY A04538 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - signed chap.463
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the issuance of deer management permits for certain service-connected disabled veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the issuance of deer management permits for certain service-connected disabled veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatesigned chap.463
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-05-07SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-07Senate3RD READING CAL.507
2018-05-07SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S723A
2018-04-30SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2018-04-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-04-30Assemblypassed assembly
2018-04-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.785
2018-04-24Assemblyreported
2018-04-17Assemblyprint number 4538a
2018-04-17Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2017-02-02Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S00723 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4538A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04538&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04538&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04538
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04538&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04538A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04538&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04538&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A4538#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback