NY A04539 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.460
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.460
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town board of the town of Queensbury, in the county of Warren, to diminish the area of the Glen Lake aquatic plant growth control district by removing certain parcels of land therefrom that are not benefited by such district.
Title
Authorizes the town board of the town of Queensbury, in the county of Warren, to diminish the area of the Glen Lake aquatic plant growth control district by removing certain parcels of land therefrom that are not benefited by such district.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.460 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.344 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a4539a |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1179 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 2024A |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s2024a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.344 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.344 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | print number 4539a |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02024 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.460