NY A04540 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-07 - print number 4540b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-07 - print number 4540b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an additional tax surcharge on certain non-primary residence class one and class two properties in a city with a population of one million or more.
Title
Imposes an additional tax surcharge on certain non-primary residence class one and class two properties in a city with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | print number 4540b |
2020-10-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2020-08-17 | Assembly | print number 4540a |
2020-08-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S00044 (Same As) 2020-09-11 - PRINT NUMBER 44B