NY A04551 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for mandatory training for treasurers of political committees once every three years; requires treasurers to complete such training within forty-five days after first being appointed; requires the state board of elections to provide such training in any method it determines, as well as a web-based format; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides for mandatory training for treasurers of political committees once every three years; requires treasurers to complete such training within forty-five days after first being appointed; requires the state board of elections to provide such training in any method it determines, as well as a web-based format; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] |
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03236 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS