NY A04552 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of health to create cultural education demonstration programs for HIV/AIDS health care providers to instruct them on how to treat patients while being sensitive to their cultural traditions and mores; provides that such program shall focus on the Latin American and Asian cultures.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of health to create cultural education demonstration programs for HIV/AIDS health care providers to instruct them on how to treat patients while being sensitive to their cultural traditions and mores; provides that such program shall focus on the Latin American and Asian cultures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-02-04 | Assembly | referred to health |