NY A04552 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the military spouse act of 2019, which: requires a workshop to investigate and report about licensing and the difficulties encountered by military spouses (Part A); authorizes the state to certify persons to teach who are not graduates of teacher education programs (Part B); adopts the interstate nursing licensure compact (Part C); and authorizes licensing of military spouses with out-of-state licenses in equivalent occupations (Part D).
Title
Enacts the military spouse act of 2019, which: requires a workshop to investigate and report about licensing and the difficulties encountered by military spouses (Part A); authorizes the state to certify persons to teach who are not graduates of teacher education programs (Part B); adopts the interstate nursing licensure compact (Part C); and authorizes licensing of military spouses with out-of-state licenses in equivalent occupations (Part D).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in higher education |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08945 (Same As) 2020-08-26 - REFERRED TO RULES