NY A04579 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - print number 4579b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a blue alert system to aid in the identification, location and apprehension of any individuals suspected of killing or seriously wounding any local, state or federal law enforcement officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a blue alert system to aid in the identification, location and apprehension of any individuals suspected of killing or seriously wounding any local, state or federal law enforcement officer.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03Assemblyprint number 4579b
2019-06-03Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2019-04-09Assemblyprint number 4579a
2019-04-09Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2019-02-04Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S05925 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - referred to governmental operations

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback