NY A04615 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits police officers from using racial and ethnic profiling; requires that a procedure be established for the taking and review of complaints against police officers for racial and ethnic profiling; allows an action for injunctive relief and/or damages to be brought against a law enforcement agency, any agent of a law enforcement agency and the supervisor of an agent.
Title
Prohibits police officers from using racial and ethnic profiling; requires that a procedure be established for the taking and review of complaints against police officers for racial and ethnic profiling; allows an action for injunctive relief and/or damages to be brought against a law enforcement agency, any agent of a law enforcement agency and the supervisor of an agent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4615a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.176 |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.242 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01137 (Same As) 2020-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 1137A