NY A04654 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to develop a program for veterans who served on active duty to receive high school diplomas.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to develop a program for veterans who served on active duty to receive high school diplomas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.477 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.313 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1660A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.505 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | print number 4654a |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01660 (Same As) 2019-11-11 - signed chap.477