NY A04668 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - approval memo.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - approval memo.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disclosure of the identities of political committees making certain expenditures for political communications.
Title
Relates to disclosure of the identities of political committees making certain expenditures for political communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | approval memo.10 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | signed chap.454 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.712 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4910 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.38 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.38 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04910 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - approval memo.10