NY A04711 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - signed chap.112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - signed chap.112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes bond proceeds to be used for the construction and infrastructure improvements in the vicinity of the intersection of Michigan avenue and Broadway in the city of Buffalo.
Title
Authorizes bond proceeds to be used for the construction and infrastructure improvements in the vicinity of the intersection of Michigan avenue and Broadway in the city of Buffalo.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Senate | signed chap.112 |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1880 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4427A |
2017-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.100 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.100 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | print number 4711a |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to cities |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S04427 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4711A