NY A04734 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.122
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.122
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization.
Title
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming And Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming And Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.122 |
2019-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-07 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-07 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.243 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | substituted for a4734 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.65 |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | substituted by s2315 |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.243 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S02315 (Same As) 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.122