NY A04741 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the provisions of law authorizing hunting big game by rifle in the county of Orleans permanent.
Title
Makes the provisions of law authorizing hunting big game by rifle in the county of Orleans permanent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.299 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.258 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a4741 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1413 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s1930 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.258 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.258 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S01930 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.299