NY A04742 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.514
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.514
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the incorporation of the "Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association of Huntington Manor".
Title
Authorizes the incorporation of the "Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association of Huntington Manor".
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.514 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.347 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a4742a |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2979A |
2019-05-21 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-12 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.207 |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s2979a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.347 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.347 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 4742a |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02979 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.514