NY A04745 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization for the New York city marshals to exercise the same functions, powers and duties as sheriffs with respect to the execution of money judgments.
Title
Extends the authorization for the New York city marshals to exercise the same functions, powers and duties as sheriffs with respect to the execution of money judgments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.47 |
2019-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1070 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5776 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4745a |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.158 |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04240 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05776 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.47
S05776 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.47