NY A04757 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.677
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.677
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting abuses of persons receiving care or services in residential care facilities; includes misappropriation of property; establishes independent quality monitors and requirements relating to assets of operators.
Title
Relates to reporting abuses of persons receiving care or services in residential care facilities; includes misappropriation of property; establishes independent quality monitors and requirements relating to assets of operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.677 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.681 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a4757a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1672 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5908 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.681 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | print number 4757a |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05908 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.677