NY A04763 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to communication service surcharges applied to Onondaga county; extends provisions thereof.
Title
Relates to communication service surcharges applied to Onondaga county; extends provisions thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.124 |
2019-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.411 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | substituted for a4763 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1138 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s4294 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.411 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04294 (Same As) 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.124