NY A04768 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Paradox Lake as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Paradox Lake as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.462 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.261 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a4768 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.226 |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s2127 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.261 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.261 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02127 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.462