NY A04770 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits mortgagees from requiring mortgagors of certain real property to purchase flood insurance exceeding a coverage amount that exceeds the outstanding mortgage thereon, or that includes coverage for contents.
Title
Prohibits mortgagees from requiring mortgagors of certain real property to purchase flood insurance exceeding a coverage amount that exceeds the outstanding mortgage thereon, or that includes coverage for contents.
Sponsors
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] |
Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-12-28 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2020-12-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2020-07-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.146 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4629A |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.183 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.508 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | print number 4770a |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04629 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES