NY A04771 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the actions of the Huntington union free school district regardless of the failure of such district to timely file final building cost reports.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the actions of the Huntington union free school district regardless of the failure of such district to timely file final building cost reports.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.129 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.78 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | substituted for a4771 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.603 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s2976 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.78 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.78 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02976 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.129
S07038 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled
A08898 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled
S07038 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled
A08898 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled