NY A04775 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - signed chap.339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - signed chap.339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes Dean Pond in the county of Putnam in the list of inland waterways eligible for the local waterfront revitalization program.
Title
Includes Dean Pond in the county of Putnam in the list of inland waterways eligible for the local waterfront revitalization program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Senate | signed chap.339 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1571 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5829 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.412 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05829 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - signed chap.339