NY A04784 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s2836c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to restrictions on a sex offender's custody of or visitation with a child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to restrictions on a sex offender's custody of or visitation with a child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s2836c
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.589
2019-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.589
2019-06-19Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-06-15Assemblyprint number 4784c
2019-06-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to judiciary
2019-06-12Assemblyprint number 4784b
2019-06-12Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to judiciary
2019-05-21Assemblyprint number 4784a
2019-05-21Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to judiciary
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S02836 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04784&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04784&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04784
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04784&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04784A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04784&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04784B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04784&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04784C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04784&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04784&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04784&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback