NY A04806 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Deerfield in Oneida county to transfer jurisdiction of a road to the state.
Title
Authorizes the town of Deerfield in Oneida county to transfer jurisdiction of a road to the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03466 (Same As) 2020-06-10 - referred to transportation