NY A04816 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture, transport, shipment or possession of an undetectable knife.
Title
Prohibits the manufacture, transport, shipment or possession of an undetectable knife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.146 |
2019-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.79 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a4816 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.810 |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4202 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.79 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.79 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04202 (Same As) 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.146