NY A04827 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities, including membership requirements and powers and duties of the task force; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities, including membership requirements and powers and duties of the task force; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.280
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-05-15SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-15Senate3RD READING CAL.779
2018-05-15SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S936A
2018-04-30SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-04-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-04-30Assemblypassed assembly
2018-04-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.786
2018-04-24Assemblyreported
2018-03-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-03-05Assemblyprint number 4827a
2018-03-05Assemblyamend and recommit to veterans' affairs
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2017-02-03Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S00936 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4827A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04827&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04827&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04827
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04827&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04827A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04827&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04827&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04827&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A4827#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback