NY A04831 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "public university emergency contraception education act".
Title
Enacts the "public university emergency contraception education act".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05089 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES